Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 297 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5266 Week
» 17779 Month
» 105971 Year
» 990352 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
  7127 30/09/1947
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12040 08/03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 30/09/1947
Withdrawn 19/10/1968
Time in Service 21 yrs , 19 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1970
Cut At Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
21A Saltley 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 01/10/1966
   To Crewe Works w/e 06/01/1968
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 18/05/1968
   Withdrawn 19/10/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/09/1947 To Service To service as 12040
Built at Derby Works
   
30/09/1947 To Service To service as 7127
Built at Derby Works
   
01/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
06/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C)    
18/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
19/10/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 12040    
19/10/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 7127    
01/01/1970 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev