Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3037 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16443 Week
» 69459 Month
» 188986 Year
» 3215839 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
887 |
on |
30/03/1903 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
15 |
Company History |
CambR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
To Service |
Mon 30/03/1903 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/11/1952 |
Service Life |
49 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
on |
30/03/1903 |
OSY |
|
Oswestry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
17/11/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/11/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
18/05/1947 |
Oswestry MPD |
0-6-0's Nos. 844, 849, 855, 884 and 887 were on the shed on 18/5; of these No. 849 had been repainted and was just ex. Stafford Road Works, but it was understood that No. 898 was due for withdrawal. 2-4-0T. No. 1308 was in the shed whilst No. 1196 was on the 'dead' road. 0-6-0ST. No. 680 was in the shops and No. 1331 was in the shed. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/03/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 887 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Oswestry (OSY) |
|
|
17/11/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 887 |
|
|