Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 832 Today
» 871 Yesterday
» 832 Week
» 21814 Month
» 163768 Year
» 1048149 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12058 31/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 31/10/1949
Withdrawn 28/04/1971
Time in Service 21 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys
Cut Up 01/02/1973
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
16A Nottingham 4w/e 26/01/1952
18A Toton 4w/e 09/08/1952
16A Nottingham 5w/e 03/01/1953
14A Cricklewood East m/e 16/06/1956
1A Willesden w/e 12/12/1964
   Withdrawn 28/04/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1949 To Service To service as 12058
Built at Derby Works
   
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
03/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16A)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A)    
12/12/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
28/04/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 12058    
19/12/1971 Sightings Willesden shed. RO 3/1972  
05/02/1972 Sightings In store at Willesden RO 4/1972  
01/02/1973 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev