Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 876 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18679 Week
» 71695 Month
» 191222 Year
» 3218075 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12069 |
04/07/1950 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£16,425.00 |
To Service |
04/07/1950 to Toton (18A) |
Withdrawn |
14/03/1971 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys |
Cut Up |
03/1972 |
Cut At |
Birds (Long Marston) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/07/1950 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/07/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12069 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Devons Road (Bow) (1D) |
|
|
04/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
21/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) |
|
|
10/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
14/03/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12069 |
|
|
03/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|