Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2012 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15418 Week
» 68434 Month
» 187961 Year
» 3214814 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12070 |
11/08/1950 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Cost when Built |
£16,425.00 |
To Service |
11/08/1950 to Toton (18A) |
Withdrawn |
30/09/1969 |
Time in Service |
19 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys |
Cut Up |
08/1970 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/08/1950 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/08/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12070 Built at Derby Works |
|
|
05/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
09/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
27/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
30/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
04/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
17/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Northampton (2E) |
|
|
10/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
24/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
22/06/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
07/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
30/09/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12070 |
|
|
08/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|