Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1230 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14636 Week
» 67652 Month
» 187179 Year
» 3214032 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12073 |
30/09/1950 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
11 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
30/09/1950 to Toton (18A) |
Withdrawn |
06/11/1971 |
Time in Service |
21 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1972 |
Cut At |
C F Booth (Rotherham) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/09/1950 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/09/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12073 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
01/01/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
26/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
10/09/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
08/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
03/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
25/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
03/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
06/11/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12073 |
|
|
06/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|