Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 307 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5276 Week
» 17789 Month
» 105981 Year
» 990362 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12079 30/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 30/11/1950
Withdrawn 11/09/1971
Time in Service 20 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1972
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
68A Carlisle Kingmoor (New) 30/11/1950
12D Workington w/e 15/04/1967
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 06/01/1968
   Withdrawn 11/09/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1950 To Service To service as 12079
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)
   
15/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Workington (12D)    
06/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
11/09/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 12079    
01/06/1972 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev