Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1694 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19497 Week
» 72513 Month
» 192040 Year
» 3218893 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12081 |
30/11/1950 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/11/1950 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/11/1950 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12081 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
12/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
20/06/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12081 |
|
|
05/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|