Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 499 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5100 Week
» 16647 Month
» 416329 Year
» 492916 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12082 30/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 30/11/1950
Withdrawn 03/10/1971
Time in Service 20 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
68A Carlisle Kingmoor (New) 30/11/1950
12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 24/03/1951
68A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 12/05/1956
12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 19/05/1956
8C Speke Junction 4w/e 01/12/1956
6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 23/02/1957
8C Speke Junction 4w/e 10/08/1957
18A Toton w/e 18/07/1959
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 10/12/1966
6G Llandudno Junction w/e 15/08/1970
   Withdrawn 03/10/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1950 To Service To service as 12082
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)
   
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
12/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)    
19/05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
01/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Chester (Midland) (6A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
15/12/1961 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Shunter test house. SLS 1/1962 Link
10/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
15/08/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Llandudno Junction (6G)    
03/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 12082    

prev prev