Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 910 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6515 Week
» 18062 Month
» 417744 Year
» 494331 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12083 30/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 30/11/1950
Withdrawn 09/10/1971
Time in Service 20 yrs, 10 mths , 9 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
68A Carlisle Kingmoor (New) 30/11/1950
12A Carlisle Upperby 4w/e 24/03/1951
12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 29/11/1958
   Withdrawn 09/10/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/11/1950 To Service To service as 12083
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A)
   
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12A)    
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
09/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 12083    

prev prev