Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 913 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6518 Week
» 18065 Month
» 417747 Year
» 494334 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12093 08/09/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 08/09/1951
Withdrawn 16/05/1971
Time in Service 19 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
3B Bushbury (New) 08/09/1951
1A Willesden 8w/e 14/06/1952
3B Bushbury 3w/e 24/01/1953
2F Bescot w/e 17/04/1965
2G Ryecroft (Walsall) w/e 16/04/1966
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 01/10/1966
   Withdrawn 16/05/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/09/1951 To Service To service as 12093
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Bushbury (3B)
   
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bushbury (3B)    
17/04/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
16/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (2G)    
01/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
16/05/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 12093    

prev prev