Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 899 Today
» 900 Yesterday
» 1799 Week
» 13620 Month
» 182392 Year
» 1066773 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12113 19/07/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 19/07/1952
Withdrawn 14/03/1971
Time in Service 18 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1971
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
53A Hull Dairycoates (New) 19/07/1952
53C Hull Springhead 4w/e 23/01/1954
26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 28/01/1956
26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 18/02/1956
53C Hull Springhead 5w/e 24/03/1956
55E Normanton 4w/e 25/02/1967
55D Royston 4w/e 25/03/1967
   Withdrawn 14/03/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/07/1952 To Service To service as 12113
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)
   
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
11/11/1961 Sightings Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. SLS 1/1962 Link
25/02/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Normanton (55E)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
17/09/1967 Sightings A visit to Royston (Yorkshire) shed: On shed John Thickitt Link
14/03/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 12113    
01/08/1971 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev