Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4142 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17548 Week
» 70564 Month
» 190091 Year
» 3216944 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12114 |
19/07/1952 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/07/1952 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/07/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12114 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
05/10/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12114 |
|
|
09/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Rail: at Stratford MPD |
|
|