Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1059 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6962 Week
» 27925 Month
» 64678 Year
» 575780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 534   03/1877
LMS 11307 y/e 1924
BR 51307 y/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Kitson
To Service During 03/1877
Withdrawal During 11/1957
Scrapping During 01/1958
Service Life 80 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
23A Bank Hall 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B Aintree 4w/e 22/03/1952
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 19/04/1952
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 23/02/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 23A Bank Hall w/e 30/11/1946
LOAN 27B Aintree 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   w/e 23/11/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1877 To Service To service as LYR Number 534
Built at Kitson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11307    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 51307    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
19/04/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 51307    

prev