Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 918 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 3740 Week
» 22211 Month
» 157876 Year
» 668978 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 559   08/1877
LMS 11325 y/e 1924
BR 51325 y/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 08/1877
Withdrawal During 03/1949
Scrapping During 04/1949
Service Life 71 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
23A Bank Hall 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 23A Bank Hall w/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) w/e 17/01/1948
WDN   w/e 05/03/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1877 To Service To service as LYR Number 559
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11325    
01/01/1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 51325 but not taken up    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A)    
03/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 11325    

prev prev