Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 918 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 3740 Week
» 22211 Month
» 157876 Year
» 668978 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 562   10/1877
LMS 11338 y/e 1924
BR 51338 y/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Sharp Stewart
To Service During 10/1877
Withdrawal During 07/1957
Scrapping During 08/1957
Service Life 79 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26D Bury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26A Newton Heath 3w/e 14/01/1950
28B Fleetwood 4w/e 11/08/1951
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 06/10/1951
17B Burton 4w/e 29/12/1956
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 23/02/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 17/12/1949
LOAN 28B Fleetwood w/e 04/08/1951
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 27E Walton on the Hill 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 23/02/1957
WDN   w/e 20/07/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1877 To Service To service as LYR Number 562
Built at Sharp Stewart
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11338    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bury (26D)    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 51338    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (28B)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Burton (17B)    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
07/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 51338    

prev prev