Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 708 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 1604 Week
» 20075 Month
» 155740 Year
» 666842 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 549   02/1878
LMS 11358 y/e 1924
BR 51358 y/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Kitson
To Service During 02/1878
Withdrawal During 10/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 81 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25A Wakefield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 14/08/1948
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 04/09/1948
WDN   23/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1878 To Service To service as LYR Number 549
Built at Kitson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11358    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 51358    
10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 51358    

prev prev