Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1059 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6962 Week
» 27925 Month
» 64678 Year
» 575780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 164   10/1878
LMS 11371 y/e 1924
BR 51371 w/e 18/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Kitson
To Service During 10/1878
Withdrawal During 03/1961
Scrapping During 04/1961
Service Life 82 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
23A Bank Hall 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 23/02/1957
27A Bank Hall 4w/e 23/03/1957
24A Accrington 4w/e 10/08/1957
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 28/12/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 28/12/1957
WDN   w/e 25/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1878 To Service To service as LYR Number 164
Built at Kitson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11371    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bank Hall (23A)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 51371    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
23/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
10/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 51371    

prev prev