Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 705 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 1601 Week
» 20072 Month
» 155737 Year
» 666839 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 166   05/1880
LMS 11419 y/e 1924
BR 51419 y/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Kitson
To Service During 05/1880
Withdrawal During 09/1961
Scrapping During 12/1961
Service Life 81 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26D Bury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 29/01/1955
24F Fleetwood 4w/e 26/02/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 24F Fleetwood 4w/e 26/02/1955
WDN   w/e 23/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1880 To Service To service as LYR Number 166
Built at Kitson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11419    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bury (26D)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 51419    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Fleetwood (24F)    
09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 51419    
09/12/1961 Sightings Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Scrap yard - being cut up. SLS 1/1962 Link

prev prev