Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1671 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15077 Week
» 68093 Month
» 187620 Year
» 3214473 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
12126 |
15/11/1952 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/11/1952 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/11/1952 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 12126 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
18/02/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
11/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
25/11/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12126 |
|
|
07/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |
|
|