Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1060 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6963 Week
» 27926 Month
» 64679 Year
» 575781 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 845   03/1885
LMS 11488 y/e 1924
BR 51488 y/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Kitson
To Service During 03/1885
Withdrawal During 03/1956
Scrapping During 04/1956
Service Life 71 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26A Newton Heath 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 03/12/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 06/05/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 03/12/1955
WDN   w/e 10/03/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1885 To Service To service as LYR Number 845
Built at Kitson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11488    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 51488    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
03/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 51488    

prev prev