Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1061 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6964 Week
» 27927 Month
» 64680 Year
» 575782 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 846   03/1885
LMS 11496 y/e 1924
BR 51496 y/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Kitson
To Service During 03/1885
Withdrawal During 03/1961
Scrapping During 04/1961
Service Life 75 yrs, 11 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26A Newton Heath 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   To Horwich Works 4w/e 21/03/1953
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 18/04/1953
26B Agecroft 4w/e 18/05/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CMEHorwich   4w/e 21/03/1953
EXLOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 18/04/1953
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   w/e 18/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1885 To Service To service as LYR Number 846
Built at Kitson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11496    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 51496    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Horwich Works (99H)    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 51496    

prev prev