Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 708 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 1604 Week
» 20075 Month
» 155740 Year
» 666842 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 586   04/1881
LMS 11497 y/e 1924
BR 51497 y/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 04/1881
Withdrawal During 05/1959
Scrapping During 09/1961
Service Life 78 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24B Rose Grove 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24A Accrington 4w/e 11/09/1954
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 28/12/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 04/09/1954
WDN   w/e 16/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1881 To Service To service as LYR Number 586
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11497    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rose Grove (24B)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 51497    
11/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 51497    
30/04/1961 Sightings Seen dumped at Agecroft depot Tony Gillett  

prev prev