Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1060 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6963 Week
» 27926 Month
» 64679 Year
» 575781 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 851   04/1885
LMS 11498 y/e 1924
BR 51498 y/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Kitson
To Service During 04/1885
Withdrawal w/e Sat 26/11/1960
Scrapping During 01/1961
Service Life 75 yrs, 7 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24F Fleetwood 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 26/02/1955
26C Bolton 4w/e 18/05/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 26/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 18/05/1957
WDN   w/e 26/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1885 To Service To service as LYR Number 851
Built at Kitson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11498    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Fleetwood (24F)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 51498    
26/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
18/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
26/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 51498    

prev prev