Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1059 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6962 Week
» 27925 Month
» 64678 Year
» 575780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 764   10/1881
LMS 11499 y/e 1924
BR 51499 y/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
To Service During 10/1881
Withdrawal During 06/1957
Scrapping During 08/1957
Service Life 75 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24D Lower Darwen 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26B Agecroft 4w/e 06/10/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24F Fleetwood w/e 12/06/1948
EXLOAN 24D Lower Darwen w/e 24/07/1948
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 06/10/1956
WDN   w/e 25/05/1957
ALLOC 2A Rugby 4w/e 15/06/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1881 To Service To service as LYR Number 764
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd.
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11499    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lower Darwen (24D)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 51499    
06/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
06/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 51499    

prev prev