Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 145 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 1218 Week
» 20544 Month
» 247305 Year
» 758407 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 579   10/1880
LMS 11500 y/e 1924
BR 51500 y/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 10/1880
Withdrawal During 02/1957
Scrapping During 02/1957
Service Life 76 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25A Wakefield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 06/12/1947
ALLOC 26B Agecroft w/e 14/08/1948
WDN   w/e 16/02/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1880 To Service To service as LYR Number 579
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11500    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 51500    
02/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 51500    

prev prev