Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 724 Today
» 962 Yesterday
» 1686 Week
» 18486 Month
» 334717 Year
» 845819 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 787   03/1882
LMS 11503 y/e 1924
BR 51503 y/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
To Service During 03/1882
Withdrawal Thu 11/04/1957
Scrapping During 05/1957
Service Life 75 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25A Wakefield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25C Goole 4w/e 16/05/1953
   Withdrawn 11/04/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 06/12/1947
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen w/e 10/04/1948
LOAN 25E Sowerby Bridge w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC 25C Goole 4w/e 16/05/1953
WDN   11/04/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1882 To Service To service as LYR Number 787
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd.
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11503    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 51503    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
11/04/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 51503    

prev prev