Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1062 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6965 Week
» 27928 Month
» 64681 Year
» 575783 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 761   09/1881
LMS 11526 y/e 1924
BR 51526 y/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 23
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0ST
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
To Service During 09/1881
Withdrawal During 09/1957
Scrapping During 10/1957
Service Life 76 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
24C Lostock Hall 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24F Fleetwood w/e 17/05/1947
EXLOAN 24C Lostock Hall w/e 16/08/1947
WDN   w/e 21/09/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1881 To Service To service as LYR Number 761
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd.
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11526    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lostock Hall (24C)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 51526    
09/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 51526    

prev prev