Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 225 Today
» 839 Yesterday
» 225 Week
» 18546 Month
» 106738 Year
» 991119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12130 15/11/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 15/11/1952
Withdrawn 16/07/1972
Time in Service 19 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy
Cut Up 01/02/1973
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 15/11/1952
30A Stratford 5w/e 17/12/1955
   Withdrawn 16/07/1972


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/11/1952 To Service To service as 12130
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to March (31B)
   
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/07/1972 Withdrawn Condemned as 12130    
01/02/1973 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev