Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 919 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 3741 Week
» 22212 Month
» 157877 Year
» 668979 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1023   11/1889
LMS 12088 y/e 1924
BR 52088 y/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 11/1889
Withdrawal During 07/1951
Service Life 61 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
8C Speke Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10C Patricroft 4w/e 27/01/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 01/10/1949
ALLOC 10C Patricroft m/e 31/01/1951
WDN   w/e 30/06/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1889 To Service To service as LYR Number 1023
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12088    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Speke Junction (8C)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52088    
27/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
07/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 52088    

prev