Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1062 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6965 Week
» 27928 Month
» 64681 Year
» 575783 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1024   12/1889
LMS 12089 y/e 1924
BR 52089 y/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 12/1889
Withdrawal During 11/1960
Service Life 70 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
20D Normanton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26A Newton Heath 3w/e 24/01/1953
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 21/02/1953
56F Low Moor 5w/e 20/04/1957
56D Mirfield w/e 21/03/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 56F Low Moor 4w/e 29/12/1956
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   10/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1889 To Service To service as LYR Number 1024
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12089    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Normanton (20D)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52089    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
21/03/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 52089    

prev prev