Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 709 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 1605 Week
» 20076 Month
» 155741 Year
» 666843 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1030   02/1890
LMS 12093 y/e 1924
BR 52093 y/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 02/1890
Withdrawal During 09/1962
Scrapping During 09/1962
Service Life 72 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   To Crewe Works 4w/e 21/02/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 23B Aintree w/e 09/04/1949
LOAN CreweWorks   4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC MEECrewe   4w/e 18/04/1953
WDN   w/e 01/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1890 To Service To service as LYR Number 1030
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12093    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52093    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the Works - Works shunter. SLS 1/1962 Link
08/04/1962 Sightings Crewe Works visit: Around the works - Works shunter. SLS 5/1962 Link
09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 52093    

prev prev