Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 704 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 1600 Week
» 20071 Month
» 155736 Year
» 666838 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1032   02/1890
LMS 12095 y/e 1924
BR 52095 y/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 02/1890
Withdrawal During 11/1959
Scrapping During 03/1960
Service Life 69 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
20D Normanton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B Aintree 3w/e 24/01/1953
27B Aintree 4w/e 21/02/1953
27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 21/03/1953
24B Rose Grove 4w/e 29/12/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 20C Royston w/e 06/11/1948
LOAN 27B Aintree 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 29/12/1956
WDN   w/e 28/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1890 To Service To service as LYR Number 1032
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12095    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Normanton (20D)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52095    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
29/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (24B)    
11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 52095    

prev prev