Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1059 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6962 Week
» 27925 Month
» 64678 Year
» 575780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1063   11/1890
LMS 12104 y/e 1924
BR 52104 y/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 11/1890
Withdrawal During 03/1956
Scrapping During 03/1956
Service Life 65 yrs, 3 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25F Low Moor 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25D Mirfield 4w/e 11/09/1954
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25D Mirfield 4w/e 04/09/1954
WDN   w/e 03/03/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1890 To Service To service as LYR Number 1063
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12104    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Low Moor (25F)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52104    
11/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
03/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 52104    

prev prev