Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 710 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 1606 Week
» 20077 Month
» 155742 Year
» 666844 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1064   11/1890
LMS 12105 y/e 1924
BR 52105 y/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 11/1890
Withdrawal During 04/1953
Service Life 62 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
4A Shrewsbury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10B Preston 5w/e 16/07/1949
10C Patricroft 4w/e 11/08/1951
8A Edge Hill 4w/e 26/01/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 06/12/1947
ALLOC 10B Preston w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC 10C Patricroft w/e 04/08/1951
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 26/01/1952
WDN   w/e 25/04/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1890 To Service To service as LYR Number 1064
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12105    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A)    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52105    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (10C)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
04/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 52105    

prev prev