Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1061 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6964 Week
» 27927 Month
» 64680 Year
» 575782 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1066   12/1890
LMS 12107 y/e 1924
BR 52107 y/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 12/1890
Withdrawal During 03/1953
Service Life 62 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
2D Nuneaton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
7D Rhyl 4w/e 26/01/1952
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 8w/e 14/06/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2D Nuneaton w/e 06/12/1947
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 7D Rhyl 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 17/05/1952
WDN   w/e 07/03/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1890 To Service To service as LYR Number 1066
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12107    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52107    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (7D)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
03/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 52107    

prev prev