Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 708 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 1604 Week
» 20075 Month
» 155740 Year
» 666842 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1067   12/1890
LMS 12108 y/e 1924
BR 52108 y/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 12/1890
Withdrawal During 10/1959
Scrapping During 12/1959
Service Life 68 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
20C Royston 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26F Lees (Oldham) 3w/e 24/01/1953
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 21/02/1953
26C Bolton 4w/e 05/11/1955
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 28/01/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 28/01/1956
WDN   w/e 24/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1890 To Service To service as LYR Number 1067
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12108    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Royston (20C)    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52108    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
05/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
28/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 52108    

prev prev