Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 708 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 1604 Week
» 20075 Month
» 155740 Year
» 666842 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1079   04/1891
LMS 12119 y/e 1924
BR 52119 y/e 01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 04/1891
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/10/1962
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 71 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
4A Shrewsbury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
6K Rhyl 4w/e 30/11/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 13/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 4A Shrewsbury w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC 7B Bangor w/e 27/03/1948
ALLOC 6K Rhyl 4w/e 30/11/1957
WDN   w/e 13/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1891 To Service To service as LYR Number 1079
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12119    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A)    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 52119    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Rhyl (6K)    
13/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 52119    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev