Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 708 Today
» 896 Yesterday
» 1604 Week
» 20075 Month
» 155740 Year
» 666842 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1083   05/1891
LMS 12123 y/e 1924
BR 52123 y/e 04/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 05/1891
Withdrawal During 09/1957
Scrapping During 10/1957
Service Life 66 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
16A Nottingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26C Bolton 3w/e 24/01/1953
26C Bolton 4w/e 21/02/1953
27C Southport 8w/e 16/07/1955
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 26C Bolton 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 27C Southport 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   w/e 07/09/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1891 To Service To service as LYR Number 1083
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12123    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A)    
04/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 52123    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Southport (27C)    
09/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 52123    

prev prev