Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1060 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6963 Week
» 27926 Month
» 64679 Year
» 575781 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1085   05/1891
LMS 12125 y/e 1924
BR 52125 y/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 05/1891
Withdrawal During 11/1957
Scrapping During 02/1958
Service Life 66 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
7D Rhyl 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 08/09/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) w/e 01/09/1951
WDN   w/e 30/11/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1891 To Service To service as LYR Number 1085
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12125    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Rhyl (7D)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 52125    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (10E)    
11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 52125    

prev prev