Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1059 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6962 Week
» 27925 Month
» 64678 Year
» 575780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1113   10/1891
LMS 12132 y/e 1924
BR 52132 y/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 10/1891
Withdrawal During 03/1957
Scrapping During 05/1957
Service Life 65 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26A Newton Heath 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26C Bolton 8w/e 11/07/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 13/06/1953
WDN   w/e 02/03/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1891 To Service To service as LYR Number 1113
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12132    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 52132    
11/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
03/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 52132    

prev prev