Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1059 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6962 Week
» 27925 Month
» 64678 Year
» 575780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1114   10/1891
LMS 12133 y/e 1924
BR 52133 y/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 10/1891
Withdrawal During 01/1961
Scrapping During 02/1961
Service Life 69 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25C Goole 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
25A Wakefield 4w/e 02/12/1950
56E Sowerby Bridge w/e 19/11/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 25A Wakefield m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 56E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 26/11/1960
WDN   28/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1891 To Service To service as LYR Number 1114
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12133    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Goole (25C)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52133    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
19/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E)    
01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 52133    

prev prev