Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1059 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6962 Week
» 27925 Month
» 64678 Year
» 575780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1117   10/1891
LMS 12135 y/e 1924
BR 52135 y/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 10/1891
Withdrawal During 11/1959
Scrapping During 01/1960
Service Life 68 yrs, 1 mth , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
16A Nottingham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B Aintree 3w/e 24/01/1953
27B Aintree 4w/e 21/02/1953
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 27B Aintree 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   w/e 07/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1891 To Service To service as LYR Number 1117
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12135    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nottingham (16A)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52135    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 52135    

prev prev