Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 918 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 3740 Week
» 22211 Month
» 157876 Year
» 668978 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1118   10/1891
LMS 12136 y/e 1924
BR 52136 y/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 10/1891
Withdrawal During 08/1957
Scrapping During 09/1957
Service Life 65 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26A Newton Heath 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
27B Aintree 4w/e 04/10/1952
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26C Bolton w/e 04/06/1949
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 04/10/1952
WDN   w/e 31/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1891 To Service To service as LYR Number 1118
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12136    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Newton Heath (26A)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52136    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 52136    

prev prev