Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 915 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 3737 Week
» 22208 Month
» 157873 Year
» 668975 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1119   10/1891
LMS 12137 y/e 1924
BR 52137 y/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 10/1891
Withdrawal During 06/1954
Service Life 62 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26B Agecroft 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26D Bury 5w/e 16/07/1949
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26B Agecroft w/e 09/11/1946
ALLOC 26D Bury w/e 25/06/1949
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 25/02/1950
WDN   26/06/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1891 To Service To service as LYR Number 1119
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12137    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Agecroft (26B)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52137    
16/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
06/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 52137    

prev prev