Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1059 Today
» 1321 Yesterday
» 6962 Week
» 27925 Month
» 64678 Year
» 575780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1121   11/1891
LMS 12139 y/e 1924
BR 52139 y/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 11/1891
Withdrawal During 02/1960
Scrapping During 02/1961
Service Life 68 yrs , 3 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
26D Bury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
26C Bolton 8w/e 29/11/1952
25D Mirfield m/e 16/06/1956
   Withdrawn m/e 02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26D Bury w/e 11/10/1947
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 16/06/1956
WDN   w/e 05/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1891 To Service To service as LYR Number 1121
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12139    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bury (26D)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 52139    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 52139    

prev prev