Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 919 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 3741 Week
» 22212 Month
» 157877 Year
» 668979 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1122   11/1891
LMS 12140 y/e 1924
BR 52140 y/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 11/1891
Withdrawal During 07/1960
Scrapping During 08/1960
Service Life 68 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
8B Warrington Dallam 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
8C Speke Junction 4w/e 06/10/1951
8A Edge Hill 4w/e 16/05/1953
10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 30/11/1957
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 25/01/1958
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 27/03/1948
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction w/e 06/10/1951
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 02/11/1957
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 29/11/1958
WDN   w/e 16/07/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1891 To Service To service as LYR Number 1122
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12140    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Warrington Dallam (8B)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 52140    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
30/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (10D)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
07/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 52140    

prev prev