Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 397 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 5366 Week
» 17879 Month
» 106071 Year
» 990452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 12136 17/01/1953

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 11
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 17/01/1953
Withdrawn 30/12/1971
Time in Service 18 yrs, 11 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 01/03/1977
Cut At T W Ward (Beighton)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) 17/01/1953
31B March w/e 29/11/1958
31A Cambridge w/e 05/10/1963
31B March w/e 04/06/1966
30A Stratford w/e 14/09/1968
   Withdrawn 30/12/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
17/01/1953 To Service To service as 12136
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
29/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
04/06/1966 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/09/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
30/12/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 12136    
01/03/1977 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev