Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 786 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4302 Week
» 32260 Month
» 66902 Year
» 1288467 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 1300 m/e 01/1896
LMS 12322 y/e 1924
BR 52322 m/e 07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Aspinall
Class 27
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 01/1896
Withdrawal w/e Sat 06/08/1960
Service Life 64 yrs, 7 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
2D Nuneaton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 06/09/1952
10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 11/08/1956
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 25/01/1958
26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 06/09/1958
   Withdrawn w/e 06/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 2D Nuneaton w/e 06/12/1947
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 06/09/1952
ALLOC 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) 4w/e 14/07/1956
LOAN 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 25/01/1958
LOAN 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 06/09/1958
ALLOC 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 29/11/1958
WDN   w/e 06/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1896 To Service To service as LYR Number 1300
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 12322    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nuneaton (2D)    
07/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 52322    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (10A)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sutton Oak (10D)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
06/09/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 52322    

prev prev