Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1815 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15221 Week
» 68237 Month
» 187764 Year
» 3214617 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway |
442 |
m/e |
10/1900 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
12417 |
y/e |
1924 |
British Railways |
52417 |
y/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Aspinall |
Class |
27 |
Company History |
LYR/LMS |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 10/1900 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 14/02/1948 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
w/e |
14/02/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway Number 442 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 12417 |
|
|
08/02/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
11/04/1936 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (23D) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 52417 but not taken up |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 12417 |
|
|